Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chairez Christina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Koulloukian Nazo Leon, against Rich Holdings Inc., Rich Products Corporation, represented by Grix Monte, Lopez Ferry Eden Bagona, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Cristina Chairez against Rich Products Corporation, Rich Holdings Inc., and other defendants. The lawsuit alleges violations of various wage and hour laws in California. The plaintiff claims that the ...
Complaint
Date: June 09, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Rich Products Corporation (Defendant)
Date: October 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christina Chairez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rich Products Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice To State Court Of Removal To Federal Court; Filed by: Rich Products Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Christina Chairez (Plaintiff); As to: Rich Products Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Status Report
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Removal) of 07/29/2021)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice To State Court Of Removal To Federal Court
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.