Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hhana Mukaram, Mukaram Hhana As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Stephen A. Cohen Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Stanley Y.Y. Goo And As Trustee Of The Stephen A. Cohen Trust, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Chung Bryon Yoonsuk, Dorenfeld David K, Mazarei Mazyar H., against Gershon Candice Vega, Gershon Joshua, represented by Hom Tracey, Vega Rogelio O., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mukaram Hhana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Non PI) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Candice Vega Gershon; On the Complaint filed by Mukaram Hhana, et al. on
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Joshua Gershon; On the Complaint filed by Mukaram Hhana, et al. on
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Candice Vega Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Candice Vega Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Candice Vega Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Joshua Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 10, 2021Complaint
Date: May 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF MO...)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NON PI)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NON PI) OF 12/15/2022
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mukaram Hhana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Complaint) Filed by Mukaram Hhana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Joshua Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Joshua Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Candice Vega Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Notice of Case Management Conference) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Non PI)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Non PI) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Candice Vega Gershon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.