Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jackson Nathan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Denis David R., Denis David Robert, against City Of Los Angeles, represented by Park Karen Jungyoon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Reply City's Reply MTC Further Responses RFP Set One; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Objection [Evidentiary] to New Evidence; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Objection to Improperly Submitted Declaration and Evidence; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: October 03, 2023Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: October 03, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 08, 2021Complaint
Date: April 08, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021
Date: April 15, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 11, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 26, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 13, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: November 30, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: November 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Date: January 03, 2022Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED
Date: January 25, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO IMPROPERLY SUBMITTED DECLARATION AND EVIDENCE
Date: January 26, 2022Objection - OBJECTION [EVIDENTIARY] TO NEW EVIDENCE
Date: January 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 28, 2022Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: February 01, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 01, 2022Answer
Date: February 07, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 04, 2022Separate Statement
Date: April 04, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: April 12, 2022Reply - REPLY CITY'S REPLY MTC FURTHER RESPONSES RFP SET ONE
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Reply - REPLY CITY'S REPLY MTC FURTHER RESPONSES FROGS-GENERAL SET ONE
Date: June 07, 2022Reply - REPLY CITY'S REPLY MTC FURTHER RESPONSES FROGS - EMPLOYMENT SET 1
Date: June 07, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 14, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 15, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 08, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 21, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: March 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Reply (City's Reply MTC Further Responses RFP Set One) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Objection ([Evidentiary] to New Evidence) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Objection (to Improperly Submitted Declaration and Evidence) Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2021)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel for Defendant City of Los Angeles)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Oppositions to Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Objection ([Evidentiary] to New Evidence)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Objection (to Improperly Submitted Declaration and Evidence)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Nathan Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.