Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nguyen Sang, Vo Ngo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nguyen Tuan Anh, against Shieh Shiao Yi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 23, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 23, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]
Date: April 09, 2021PI General Order
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2021Complaint Filed by Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff); As to: Shiao Yi Shieh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Sang Nguyen (Plaintiff); Ngo Vo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.