Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cantarero Santiago, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joy Matthew K., against 4A Crane Service Inc., Guzman Edward, represented by Bremer Keith, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 22, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: March 22, 2021PI General Order
Date: April 12, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: July 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2022Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: 4A Crane Service, Inc. (Defendant); Edward Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by 4A Crane Service, Inc. (Defendant); Edward Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by 4A Crane Service, Inc. (Defendant); Edward Guzman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Santiago Cantarero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.