Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carcamo Cindy, Lara-Caballero Sonia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Perry Liam, against Martinez Paul, represented by Dagmy Robert J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Paul Martinez (Defendant); As to: Cindy Carcamo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 22, 2021Complaint
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 22, 2021PI General Order
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 06, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022Answer
Date: October 26, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 29, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: October 26, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 26, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 26, 2022Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cindy Carcamo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance) Filed by Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Paul Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
March 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
March 23, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 23, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Continued | |
March 23, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 | |
March 23, 2023 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Trial Setting Conference) | |
March 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trial Setting Conference Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
March 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.