Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arakelyan Karen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zhubrak Stephanie, against James River Insurance Company, represented by Zhubrak Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 17, 2021Petition for Coordination
Date: March 17, 2021PI General Order
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 24, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: KAREN ARAKELYAN (Claimant)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Petition for Coordination Filed by Karen Arakelyan (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by KAREN ARAKELYAN (Claimant)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Karen Arakelyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Karen Arakelyan (Plaintiff); JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Petition for Coordination
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.