Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kamali Rima, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Roland Catherine Jean, Silverstein Douglas Neil, against David G. Davtyan M.D., represented by Kislik Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin S. Escalante Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Memorandum Plaintiff's Informal Discovery Conference statement; Filed by: Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Rima Kamali (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 12, 2021Complaint
Date: March 12, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: April 05, 2021Answer
Date: June 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 20, 2021Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: July 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: September 09, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINES
Date: November 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: February 27, 2023Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: March 10, 2023TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL) Filed by David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Rima Kamali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINES) Filed by David G. Davtyan, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.