Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Parseghian Berj, Parseghian Berj In The Public Interest, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jivalagian Caspar Esq., Krikorian Tro, against Alli & Rose Llc, represented by Gilhuly R. Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lia R. Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLia R. Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff); As to: Alli & Rose, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BERJ PARSEGHIAN (Plaintiff); As to: Alli & Rose, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: BERJ PARSEGHIAN (Plaintiff); As to: Alli & Rose, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 09, 2021Complaint
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 17, 2021Motion for Stipulated Judgment
Date: June 18, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 04, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT ON PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: September 15, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/23/2021
Date: September 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 23, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 28, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion for Stipulated Judgment Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by BERJ PARSEGHIAN, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT ALLI & ROSE, LLC?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND CIVIL PENALTIES)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Stipulated Judgment
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Vache Thomassian in Support of Motion for Stipulated Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.