Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER, CHIEF, DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT, DIR, STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
On February 18, 2021 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 18, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
14 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION 15 FAILURE TO TURN OVER ASSETS PURSUANT TO LEVY (CA LAB. § 96.8) 16 (PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS)
6 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION
3 I. As to ALL CAUSES OF ACTION:
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles on February 18, 2021. The complaint is brought by the California Labor Commissioner against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Does 1-25. T…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 23, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 23, 2023 | hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California as to the entire action |
|
January 19, 2023 | Request for Dismissal | ||
November 15, 2022 | hearing | Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Status Conference) | |
November 15, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation - No Order Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
November 10, 2022 | Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 31, 2022 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
August 31, 2022 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
August 31, 2022 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
June 16, 2022 | hearing | There being no judge available this date, Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
June 16, 2022 | hearing | Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Status Conference) | |
June 16, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order Regarding the Production of Confidential Documents and Other Designation Information; Signed and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
February 15, 2022 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND OTHER DESIGNATION INFORMATION | ||
October 04, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 04, 2021 | hearing | Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
October 04, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
October 04, 2021 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
October 04, 2021 | hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
October 04, 2021 | hearing |
Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
October 04, 2021 | Case Management Order | ||
October 04, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2021 | Answer | ||
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
August 05, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
August 04, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
August 04, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
July 26, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
July 26, 2021 | Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) | ||
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
July 26, 2021 | hearing |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
July 21, 2021 | Case Management Statement |
|
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
July 21, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
July 02, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Signed and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2021 | Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); As to: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
June 18, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Gregory Keosian |
|
June 11, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 10, 2021 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Melvin Yee (Attorney) updated | |
March 04, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Melvin Yee (Attorney): Middle Name: blank | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 | |
March 04, 2021 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
March 04, 2021 | Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service | ||
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
March 03, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
February 26, 2021 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff) |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: State Labor Commissioner, Chief, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, DIR, State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant) |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | Complaint | ||
February 18, 2021 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|