Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Murray Cheryl, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Lynwood Jail, represented by Hurrell Thomas Charles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles Erroneously Sued As Lynwood Jail (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff); As to: Lynwood Jail (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Dismissal for Failure to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by County of Los Angeles Erroneously Sued As Lynwood Jail (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Cheryl Murray (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFF'S NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Dismissal for Failure to ...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Dismissal for Failure to ...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFF'S NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff's...))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.