Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Ramirez Enrique Bautista, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Quintero Antonio, Quintero Julie, represented by Magnus Sheila, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 11, 2021Complaint
Date: February 11, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 11, 2021PI General Order
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 23, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 13, 2023Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, PREVIOUSLY FILED 1/13/23
Date: January 13, 2023PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Antonio Quintero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Antonio Quintero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Antonio Quintero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (NOT Entered, Previously Filed ) Filed by Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Antonio Quintero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Antonio Quintero (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Antonio Quintero (Defendant); As to: Enrique Bautista Ramirez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.