Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kaloustian In The Public Interest Tamar, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jivalagian Caspar S., against Lotus Foods Inc., Whole Foods Market California Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Adams Jennifer, Blaxter J T Wells, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMel Red Recana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order Re: Ruling on Motion for Entry of Stipulated Consent Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 16, 2022Declaration in Support; Filed by: TAMAR KALOUSTIAN, in the public interest (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lotus Foods, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: J T Wells Blaxter (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TAMAR KALOUSTIAN, in the public interest (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 27, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 27, 2021Complaint
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 29, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 18, 2021Answer
Date: March 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2021Answer
Date: April 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 19, 2021Motion for Stipulated Judgment
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 05, 2022Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STIPULATED JUDGMENT)
Date: May 24, 2022Judgment - JUDGMENT ON PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: June 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (in Support)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Stipulated Judgment
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.