Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Antonio Sherry, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Smith Jay, against City Of Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 05, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 04, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021PI General Order
Date: February 09, 2021Complaint
Date: January 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]
Date: February 09, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: March 10, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 22, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 22, 2022Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 28, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 15, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: June 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 21, 2022Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: June 30, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 30, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 06, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 02, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 03, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: September 16, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL
Date: January 25, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))
Date: February 07, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 30, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: March 30, 2023Exhibit List
Date: March 30, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 05, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: April 13, 2023Answer
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Dismissal; Filed by: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Default entered as to City Of Los Angeles; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Sherry Antonio on
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment; Filed by: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff); As to: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL;) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff); As to: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Dismissal) Filed by City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff); As to: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Sherry Antonio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.