Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Glendale Chapter Of The Armenian Cultural Foundation An Unincorporated Association, North Hollywood Chapter Of The Armenian Cultural Foundation An Unincorporated Association, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Rosen David E., against Armenian Cultural Foundation A California Public Benefit Nonprofit Corporation, represented by Reeder Christopher S, Sedor Daniel Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NTR; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 21, 2023Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B325601; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 25, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B325601; NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 25, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: June 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 25, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 08, 2021Answer
Date: August 20, 2021Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: October 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: October 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HTTPS://CRM.LACOURT.ORG/)
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC))
Date: October 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION AND COUNSEL'S MEDICAL LEAVE
Date: January 07, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF ITS PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 08, 2022Exhibit List
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 08, 2022Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: August 25, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER S. REEDER IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 13, 2022Judgment
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AN...)
Date: September 28, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: October 13, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: October 31, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 17, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PETITIONERS, GLENDALE CHAPTER OF THE ARMENIAN CULTU...)
Date: December 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: December 09, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: February 17, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 28, 2023Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Writs and Receivers Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Petitioner to Continue Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PETITIONERS, GLENDALE CHAPTER OF THE ARMENIAN CULTU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Writs and Receivers Court) of 07/12/2021)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE https://crm.lacourt.org/))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Writs and Receivers Court))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/08/2021)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Petition (Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate (To Compel Inspection of Corporate Documents))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/08/2021)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial Date)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.