Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Save Rancho Providencia Neighborhood An Unincorporated Association, filed a(n) Other Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Hall Jamie T., against City Of Burbank A Municipal Corporation, represented by Vanderborght Jill Alicia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell L. Beckloff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restauarants, L.L.C. (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Joinder to Motion TO STRIKE; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Order Denying Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Burbank, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restauarants, L.L.C. (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Burbank, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Raising Cane's Restauarants, L.L.C. (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Raising Cane's Restauarants, L.L.C. (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (TO STRIKE) Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Trial Setting C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Burbank, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Burbank, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants. LLC (Real Party in Interest)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by City of Burbank, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Demurrer; Hearing on Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Opposition (Real Party in Interests Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Trial Setting C...))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Eugene Holland in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun (Supplemental))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID P. WAITE IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (/ Demurrer to Petitioner's First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Petition (for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Thomas Talley in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID P. WAITE IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (Respondent City of Burbank's Notice of Errata and Corrected Declaration with Exhibits)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (RESPONDENT CITY OF BURBANNOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARING MEET AND CONFER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF EVERETT FIELDS IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Reply (Brief to Opposition of Real Party)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Reply (Brief to Opposition of City of Burbank)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (to City's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF FRED RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Petitioner's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (TO STRIKE)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (PETITIONER?S VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL WATSON IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (to City's Demurrer)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Reply (REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Demurrer; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND JOINDER TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Petitioner's Opposition to Real Party's Demurrer to Second Amended Petition)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Real Party's Demurrer)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (of John a. Pollock in Support of Real Party in Interest's Demurrer)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Opposition (RESPONDENT CITY OF BURBANKS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Amended Petition (2nd)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Petition (for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Eugene Holland in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Thomas Talley in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARING MEET AND CONFER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID P. WAITE IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Opposition (Real Party in Interests Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice (Respondent City of Burbank's Notice of Errata and Corrected Declaration with Exhibits)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun (Supplemental))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (RESPONDENT CITY OF BURBANNOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Trial Setting C...))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (/ Demurrer to Petitioner's First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID P. WAITE IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Reply (Brief to Opposition of Real Party)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Frances Offenhauser)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Brief to Opposition of City of Burbank)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF EVERETT FIELDS IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (of James Rathbun)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (RESPONDENT CITY OF BURBANKS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (TO STRIKE)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL WATSON IN SUPPORT OF REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS OPPOSITION BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie T. Hall)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (PETITIONER?S VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AMENDED PETITION)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND JOINDER TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.