Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blumenfrucht Jacob, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cave Matthew J, against Goodman Sholom, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Ann Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryConfession Of Judgment (Non-Domestic Relations) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jacob Blumenfrucht (Plaintiff); As to: Sholom Goodman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Confession of Judgment; Filed by: Jacob Blumenfrucht (Plaintiff); As to: Sholom Goodman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 11, 2021Confession of Judgment
Date: May 11, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW CAVE IN SUPPORT OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: May 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)
Date: September 09, 2021Confession of Judgment
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Proof of Service of September 9, 2021 Order on S. Goodman)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.