Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Domino Realty Management Company A California Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marker Richard A., against Dain Julianna, Julianna Dain Trustee Of The Jeff & Julie Friedman Family Trust Dated 8 9 79, represented by Berman Rachael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine W. Mandel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Complaint
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 11, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2021Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 19, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION CORRECTED DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. MARKER
Date: May 24, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2021Declaration - WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Filed by: JULIANNA DAIN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed by JULIANNA DAIN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.