Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sood Ajay, against Ung An Individual Sang, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Thomas C. Falls presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas C. Falls Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Chapter 7 - Bankruptcy; Filed by: As to: SANG UNG, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SANG UNG, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice order of chapter 7 discharge; Filed by:
Date: January 31, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 24, 2021Complaint
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VENUE
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 - BANKRUPTCY
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE ORDER OF CHAPTER 7 DISCHARGE
Date: January 31, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Venue) Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Venue)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.