Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maguire, Gerald A, Maguire, Michael E, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Maguire , John I, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: December 29, 2021Declaration
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration
Date: December 29, 2021Petition or Opposition Power of Attorney (PR4541)
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration
Date: December 29, 2021Petition Hearing
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2022Petition Hearing
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 05, 2022Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: June 21, 2022Motion - Fee
Date: June 08, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 12, 2022Order
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: June 09, 2022Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: June 08, 2022Notice of Returned Documents
Date: June 03, 2022Petition or Opposition Power of Attorney (PR4541)
Date: December 29, 2021Declaration
Date: January 21, 2022Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 09, 2022Order
Date: June 21, 2022Report
Date: August 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: June 22, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 21, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 23, 2022Review Hearing
Date: August 23, 2022Motion - Fee
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: September 15, 2022Status Conference
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: September 09, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: September 19, 2022Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: October 04, 2022Ruling
Date: October 04, 2022Association of Counsel
Date: September 28, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: September 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Motion hearings - Predisposition Motion to Continue Pending Action California CCP 377.31 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Motion to Continue Pending Action Ruling Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Under Submission for Decision
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The Court will hear from counsel. |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney/Counsel Association of Counsel |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition of John Maguire to Motion to Continue Pending Action Opposition - No Fee |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Status Conference Status of Michael and John McGuire's Petition Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.