Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Of Special Letters Of Administration W/O Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed By: Petitioner Brown, Scott |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Party: Petitioner Brown, Scott |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Personal Representative | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Received | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Petitioner Brown, Scott |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties & Liabilities of Personal Rep / Guard / Conserv Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.