Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order/Judgment Received Party: Petitioner Trucco, Mary Ann Michelle LaGrave-Suter Robert |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Party: Petitioner Trucco, Mary Ann Michelle LaGrave-Suter Robert |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Petitioner Trucco, Mary Ann Michelle LaGrave-Suter Robert |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Party: Petitioner Trucco, Mary Ann Michelle LaGrave-Suter Robert |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed Party: Petitioner Trucco, Mary Ann Michelle LaGrave-Suter Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.