Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Personal Representative | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Proof of Filing | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Under Supervision | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Petitioner Wilt, Linda Christine |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.