Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Barbara, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Hearing Recommended for approval. No appearance required.
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
October 26, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Hearing Probate Notes: Probate notes will be updated on a rolling basis, generally five days before the hearing. If no probate notes are posted two days prior to the hearing, ap...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re 1st Supplemental Petition to Enforce Money Judgment against Trust Beneficiary Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition, Filed to Enforce Money Judgment Against Trust Beneficiaryand Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
September 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Enforce Money Judgment (Supplemental) Appearances required. The following must be submitted: Amended Proof of Service of Petition (Form DE-120) – Petitioner does not...
Judge: Judge James F. Rigali |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re 1st Supplemental Petition to Enforce Money Judgment against Trust Beneficiary Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail, Filed | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.