Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sebourn Thomas J, against Soto Dennis S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Default entered as to DENNIS S SOTO; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DENNIS S SOTO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration of Non Military Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: July 13, 2022Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DENNIS S SOTO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DENNIS S SOTO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Default Judgment - Default Judgment Clerk
Date: July 13, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Military Service
Date: July 13, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.