Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Song Bora, against Aguilar Arnold J Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ARNOLD J AGUILAR, JR (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Interest; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Declaration RE: CCP 1033; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Default entered as to ARNOLD J AGUILAR, JR; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Declaration of Non Military Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ARNOLD J AGUILAR, JR (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: February 24, 2021Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 24, 2021Complaint - Complaint
Date: February 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Interest
Date: April 14, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Military Service
Date: April 14, 2022Default Judgment - Default Judgment Default Judgment
Date: April 14, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: CCP 1033
Date: April 14, 2022Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Ventura)
Date: August 10, 2022Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Ventura)
Date: April 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ARNOLD J AGUILAR, JR (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: ARNOLD J AGUILAR, JR (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.