Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Medina Vicente, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Medina Maria Del Rosario, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Reginald Yates presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReginald Yates Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 (FL case) | ||
August 12, 2022 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
August 12, 2022 | Judgment | ||
August 03, 2022 | Declaration - Default FL170 | ||
June 16, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
June 13, 2022 | Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - res | ||
June 13, 2022 | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | ||
June 13, 2022 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
June 13, 2022 | Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure | ||
February 22, 2022 | FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.