Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Leisge, Brandon Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Rodney A Cortez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodney A Cortez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
CategoryInfraction |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Cortez, Rodney A |
||
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 29, 2022 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Cortez, Rodney A |
||
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Citation | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Advised of Rights | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Advisement of Rights filed | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear Notice 1 | |
February 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear Eligible Case 1 | |
November 04, 2021 | Hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
November 03, 2021 | Hearing | Citation Image Loaded |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.