Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bray Sr., Kevin James, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Scott E. Seeley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryInfraction |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2022 | Hearing | Requested Arraignment Judicial Officer Baxter, James R Hearing Time 1:30 PM | |
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear Eligible Case 1 | |
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Defendant called requesting information on case | |
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Appear by Date Extension Comment FEG | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appear by Date Extension FEG |
|
August 07, 2021 | Hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
August 06, 2021 | Hearing | Citation Image Loaded |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.