Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Trieu, Alexandor, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Sinfield, Lily presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryInfraction |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Fees Removed per AB2450/AB1150 EMAT Legislation | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Failure To Pay Notice 1 | |
January 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Fees Removed Per AB177 Legislation | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.