Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Valdivia, Diane, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Rodney A Cortez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryInfraction |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | AutoCheck - Pay Plan Installment Received | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Request To Calendar Case In-Person | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AutoCheck - Pay Plan Installment Received | |
July 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Removed Per AB199 Legislation | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AutoCheck - Pay Plan Installment Received | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment Plan Notice Printed | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | AutoCheck - Pay Plan Installment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.