Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The People of the State of California vs. ANDREW RATUGO Print
On April 26, 2021 an infraction case was filed by The People Of The State Of California, against Ratugo, Andrew Timothy, represented by Campbell, James Brian, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Rodney A Cortez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Burdick, John;Category
Infraction
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Case Outcome Type
Plea
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | hearing | Officer not present | |
November 19, 2021 | hearing | Court Trial Judicial Officer Burdick, John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held | |
November 19, 2021 |
Department M4 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Burdick, John |
||
September 28, 2021 | hearing | Subpoena Returned - Officer Unable To Appear Comment Mojave CHP, sent subpoena to Mojave office | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned - Officer Unable To Appear Mojave CHP, sent subpoena to Mojave office |
|
September 27, 2021 | hearing | 10th Day: | |
September 27, 2021 | hearing | Defendant notified to appear for Court Trial Comment Atty notified | |
September 27, 2021 | hearing | Officer Subpoenaed | |
September 27, 2021 | hearing | Citing Agency Notified; Subpoena(s) Issued And Sent To Offic Comment Placed in CHP box for pickup | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant notified to appear for Court Trial Atty notified |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citing Agency Notified; Subpoena(s) Issued And Sent To Offic Placed in CHP box for pickup |
|
September 24, 2021 | hearing | Bail Waiver Filed / Trial in Absentia | |
September 24, 2021 | hearing | Waiver of Arraignment Request For Court Trial Setting Filed | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Arraignment Request For Court Trial Setting Filed | |
September 13, 2021 | hearing | Waiver of Arraignment & Court Trial Setting Form printed | |
September 13, 2021 | hearing | Trial in Absentia Form printed | |
September 10, 2021 | hearing | General time waiver | |
September 10, 2021 | hearing | Letter Received Comment Requesting Court trial | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Requesting Court trial |
|
August 19, 2021 | hearing | Appear by Date Extension | |
May 14, 2021 | hearing | Courtesy Notice Printed | |
May 14, 2021 | hearing | Citation Image Loaded |