Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jerry F. DeMelo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryDepartment Of Child Support Services - Family Support |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes and Order | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration (Paternity) | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Received Civil Subpoena for Personal Appearance at Trial or | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Advisement Pursuant to Family Code 4251 | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.