Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jerry F. DeMelo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryDepartment Of Child Support Services - Family Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes and Order | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Advisement Pursuant to Family Code 4251 | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Family Law) | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Received Civil Subpoena for Personal Appearance at Trial or | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.