Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jerry F. DeMelo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryDepartment Of Child Support Services - Family Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes and Order | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: Skinner, Mark |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | In Chambers - No Appearances | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Governmental) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment & Proof of Service by Mail | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Advisement Pursuant to Family Code 4251 | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.