Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Reissuance of Restraining Order | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Party: Respondent Pena, Jose Luis |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Filing Party: Respondent Pena, Jose Luis |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Restraining Order Party: Respondent Pena, Jose Luis |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.