Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expiration: 09/16/2022 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Restraining Order Date served: 09/07/2021 |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (New Case) | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.