Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Disclosure Filed Party: Petitioner Richardson, Eric E. |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service FL Date Served: 09/28/2023 |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response - Dissolution Party: Respondent Richardson, Shelley A. |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Requested Party: Respondent Richardson, Shelley A. |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted Party: Respondent Richardson, Shelley A. |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party Served: Respondent Richardson, Shelley A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.