Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee Party: Petitioner FigueroaSanchez, Elidia; Respondent SanchezGonzalez, Luis Eduardo |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Report Filed | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expiration: 11/18/2026 |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Reissuance of Restraining Order | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Restraining Order Date served: 07/09/2021 |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order (New Case) | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.