Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Peinado, Gregory James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party Served: Petitioner Ortiz, Jorge Luis; Respondent Garcia, Esperanza |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCSS-Order After Hearing Party: Other Party Department of Child Support Services |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail - DCSS Party: Respondent Garcia, Esperanza |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service FL Date Served: 10/29/2021 |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration Party: Petitioner Ortiz, Jorge Luis |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order No Fee Party: Petitioner Ortiz, Jorge Luis |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed by: Other Party Department of Child Support Services |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail - DCSS Party: Petitioner Ortiz, Jorge Luis; Respondent Garcia, Esperanza |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Registration of Foreign Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.