Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed Filed by: Petitioner Garcia Chavira, Ramiro |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default and Uncontested Filed Party: Petitioner Garcia Chavira, Ramiro |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Disclosure Filed Party: Petitioner Garcia Chavira, Ramiro |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 06/23/2021 |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference Information and Setting Filed | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted Party: Petitioner Garcia Chavira, Ramiro |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.