Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Singer, Blake, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Dunlap, Felicia, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 03, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order; 01/12/2021 -Temporary Orders Denied Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 02, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Child Custody & Visitation Orders as to Respondent | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.