Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Moore, Cline, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Voohries Wilburn, Coco, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-6-2021 Temporary Order Partially Granted, Continued from 12-14-2021 for Status of Orders - Heard Concurrent with 19FL00316 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
February 08, 2022 |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Stipulation to Dismiss the Restraining Order - Remailed 02/14/2022 to 1458 Esplanade Chico CA 95926 |
||
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 01/06/2021 - Temporary Orders Partly Granted, Trial Set from 10/19/2021 on Respondent's Objection Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
February 03, 2022 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 02, 2022 |
Stipulation - No Fee Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Petitioner's Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
||
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 01/06/2021 - Temporary Orders Partly Granted - Continued from 10/19/2021 for Status of the Therapy Sessions (Heard Concurrent with 19FL00316) Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
December 14, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Setting/Resetting Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 01/06/2021 - Temporary Orders Partly Granted, Trial set on Parties Objections, Set from Stipulation and Order filed 09/10/2021 for Trial Resetting Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Order on Request to Continue Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.