Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Conrad, Erica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Baeza, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Keithley, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
November 09, 2021 |
Order to Strike
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
November 05, 2021 |
Income and Expense Declaration Stricken 11/09/2021 |
||
February 11, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 10, 2021 |
Findings and Order After Hearing Hearing date of 1/26/21 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
February 04, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 01, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
||
January 26, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Request for Restraining Order Filed 01/06/2021 - Temps Denied Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service DV-200 Proof of Personal Service of DV-109 and blank DV-120 (notice of Court Hearing; Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order; blank Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order); DV-105 and DV-140 Request for Child Custody and Visitation Orders, Child Custody and Visitation Order; Notice of Assignment, Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge, Notice of Rescheduling as to respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.