Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shaver, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Order: Modification
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Order: Modification
Date: November 02, 2021Notice: Entry of Judgment
Date: April 23, 2021Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request for Order: Modification Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request for Order: Modification Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request for Order: Modification Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.