Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gregory Ackers, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Facebook, Instagram, Jack Dorsey, Mark Zuckerberg, Twitter, (total of 5) See All represented by Jonathan Alan Patchen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 29, 2021Order: Proposed
Date: December 06, 2021Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
Date: December 06, 2021Application: Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 06, 2021Order
Date: December 07, 2021Motion: Other
Date: November 15, 2021Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: September 29, 2021Order: Proposed
Date: December 06, 2021Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
Date: December 06, 2021Order: Proposed
Date: December 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing: Pro Hac Vice Counsel
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
March 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion: Order
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
February 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order & Notice of Hearings set for 3/10/22 at 1:30pm D1 - signed/SRK. | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order Granting Michael J. Gottlieb's Pro Hac Vice Application |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal Pro Hac Vice Application by Michael J. Gottlieb on behalf of Twitter, Inc. and Jack Dorsey |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application: Pro Hac Vice Pro Hac Vice Application by Kristin E. Bender on behalf of Twitter, Inc. and Jack Dorsey |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order Granting Meryl Conant Governski's Pro Hac Vice Application |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal Pro Hac Vice Application by Meryl Conant Governski on behalf of Twitter, Inc. and Jack Dorsey |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order Granting Kristin E. Bender's Pro Hac Vice Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.