Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kevin Lloyd, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by M. C. Jones, against Advanced Systems Group, Llc, Google, Llc, represented by Azniv Darbinian, Katherine Consuelo Huibonhoa, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Rudy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited(36) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kevin Lloyd against Google, LLC and Advanced Systems Group, LLC. Kevin Lloyd alleges religious discrimination, wrongful termination, retaliation, and related causes of action. He claims that he was an emplo...
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 06, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 29, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 04, 2021Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 01, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Christopher G. Rudy |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint, atty Huibonhoa |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint, atty Darbinian |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Summons |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.