Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yanqiong Xiong, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shengmao Mu, against Daniel York, represented by Alexander M. Kallis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 30, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) To Plaintiff's Complaint, Atty. Kallis |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Daniel York (no aka's) |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) A, B, and C |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Neeed exhbit cover/title page / Env. 6986584 |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.