Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ignacia Lopez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Zoi Amara Jones, against William Lain, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 30, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.