Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aixa Zuniga, Erika Gonzalez Moreno, Genaro Fernandez, Martin Zuniga, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elizabeth Bardales Moreno, against Kulvir Singh, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Drew C. Takaichi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Hearing |
OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Judge: Drew C. Takaichi |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Drew C. Takaichi |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand: Jury Trial Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Jury Fee Deposit |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 jury fee paid |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.